+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 13, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Remarks see House Journal Page 519-522
- Third consideration and final passage (190-10)
- Re-reported as committed
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 491-492
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration, with amendments
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Removed from table
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Corrective Reprint, Printer's No. 1072
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On January 22, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
+ − Votes (5)
April 20, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 160 PN 1235, 2015 A623, SUSP RULES, CARROLL
April 20, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 160 PN 1235, MOT RECON, NEUMAN
April 20, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 160 PN 1235, FP
April 15, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 160 PN 1072, 2015 A596, MACKENZIE
April 15, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 160 PN 1072, 2015 A597, MACKENZIE
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor