+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On July 13, 2016 in the House:
- Laid on the table
On June 28, 2016 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On June 10, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
On June 6, 2016 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (189-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On May 25, 2016 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On May 24, 2016 in the House:
- Removed from table
On May 23, 2016 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On October 5, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
+ − Vote
June 6, 2016: House Floor Vote: HB 1597 PN 3396, FP
+ − Sponsors (53)
Type:
Primary Sponsor