+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On November 27, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
On November 18, 2013 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Remarks see House Journal Page 1966-1967
- Third consideration and final passage
- Re-reported as committed
On November 13, 2013 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On November 12, 2013 in the House:
- Removed from table
On October 16, 2013 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On June 28, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
+ − Votes (2)
November 18, 2013: House Floor Vote: HB 1596 PN 2187, FP
October 16, 2013: House Transportation Vote: House Bill 1596 - Report Bill As Committed
+ − Sponsors (29)
Type:
Primary Sponsor