+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (31)
On April 25, 2016 in the House:
- Act No. 25
- Became Law without Governor's signature
On April 14, 2016 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
On April 13, 2016 in the House:
- Signed in Senate
- Signed in House
- Remarks see House Journal Page 641
- House concurred in Senate amendments (149-45)
- Re-reported on concurrence, as committed
- Referred to RULES
- In the House
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page 338
- Final passage (37-11)
- Vote on final passage reconsidered
- Third consideration and final passage (38-11)
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- Second consideration, with amendments (39-10)
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page 323-324
On April 11, 2016 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to APPROPRIATIONS
On April 6, 2016 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Remarks see House Journal Page 527-528
- Third consideration and final passage (176-11)
On April 5, 2016 in the House:
- Re-reported as amended
On April 4, 2016 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 450-453
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Removed from table
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On February 5, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS
+ − Votes (7)
April 13, 2016: House Floor Vote: HB 1589 PN 3178, CONCUR
April 13, 2016: House Floor Vote: HB 1589 PN 3178, MOT PROCEED WITH BILL, REED
April 13, 2016: Senate Floor Vote: HB 1589 PN 3178, FINAL PASSAGE
April 13, 2016: Senate Floor Vote: HB 1589 PN 3178, FINAL PASSAGE-RECONSIDERED
April 6, 2016: House Floor Vote: HB 1589 PN 3086, FP
April 4, 2016: House Floor Vote: HB 1589 PN 2811, 2015 A6286, STEPHENS
+ − Sponsors (41)
Type:
Primary Sponsor