+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On June 23, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to EDUCATION
On June 20, 2016 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (194-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On June 15, 2016 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
- Re-reported as committed
On June 13, 2016 in the House:
- Re-committed to RULES
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On September 30, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to EDUCATION
+ − Vote
June 20, 2016: House Floor Vote: HB 1578 PN 3499, FP
+ − Sponsors (30)
Type:
Primary Sponsor