+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On July 10, 2015 in the House:
- Act No. 23
- Approved by the Governor
On June 30, 2015 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
- Signed in Senate
- Signed in House
- Third consideration and final passage (49-0)
On June 29, 2015 in the House:
- Removed from table
On June 15, 2015 in the House:
- Laid on the table
On June 3, 2015 in the House:
- Second consideration
On June 2, 2015 in the House:
- Removed from table
On May 5, 2015 in the House:
- Laid on the table
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On February 6, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Remarks see House Journal Page 122
- Third consideration and final passage (197-0)
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 97
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration, with amendments
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On January 22, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
+ − Votes (3)
June 30, 2015: Senate Floor Vote: HB 157 PN 307, FINAL PASSAGE
February 4, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 157 PN 307, FP
February 2, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 157 PN 143, 2015 A38, WHEATLEY
+ − Sponsors (34)
Type:
Primary Sponsor