+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On July 14, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
On July 7, 2017 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (191-1)
- Re-reported as committed
On June 30, 2017 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
- Re-reported as committed
On June 26, 2017 in the House:
- Re-committed to RULES
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On June 16, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to CONSUMER AFFAIRS
+ − Vote
July 7, 2017: House Floor Vote: HB 1563 PN 2042, FP
+ − Sponsors (30)
Type:
Primary Sponsor