+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On April 1, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
On March 22, 2016 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Remarks see House Journal Page 417
- Third consideration and final passage (190-2)
- Re-reported as committed
On March 21, 2016 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Removed from table
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On September 29, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
+ − Vote
March 22, 2016: House Floor Vote: HB 1561 PN 2241, FP
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor