+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On October 4, 2019 in the House:
- Act No. 74
- Approved by the Governor
On September 26, 2019 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
On September 25, 2019 in the House:
- Signed in Senate
- Signed in House
- Third consideration and final passage (46-3)
On September 23, 2019 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
On June 27, 2019 in the House:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On June 25, 2019 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On June 21, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY
On June 20, 2019 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (192-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On June 19, 2019 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 1207-1208
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration, with amendments
- Re-reported as committed
On June 11, 2019 in the House:
- Re-committed to RULES
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On June 4, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
September 25, 2019: Senate Floor Vote: HB 1557 PN 2193, FINAL PASSAGE
June 20, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 1557 PN 2193, FP
June 19, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 1557 PN 1996, 2019 A2178, GABLER
+ − Sponsors (30)
Type:
Primary Sponsor