+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On November 27, 2019 in the House:
- Act No. 102
- Approved by the Governor
On November 22, 2019 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
On November 21, 2019 in the House:
- Signed in Senate
- Signed in House
- House concurred in Senate amendments (185-0)
- Re-reported on concurrence, as committed
On November 20, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to RULES
On November 19, 2019 in the House:
- In the House
- Third consideration and final passage (49-0)
On November 18, 2019 in the House:
- Second consideration, with amendments
On October 30, 2019 in the House:
- Reported as amended
- First consideration
On June 21, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
On June 20, 2019 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Remarks see House Journal Page 1236
- Third consideration and final passage (180-12)
- Re-reported as committed
On June 19, 2019 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
- Re-reported as committed
On June 10, 2019 in the House:
- Re-committed to RULES
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On June 3, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
November 21, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 1547 PN 2899, CONCUR
November 19, 2019: Senate Floor Vote: HB 1547 PN 2899, FINAL PASSAGE
June 20, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 1547 PN 1963, FP
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor