+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On December 27, 2019 in the House:
- Act No. 116
- Approved by the Governor
On December 18, 2019 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
- Signed in Senate
On December 17, 2019 in the House:
- Signed in House
- House concurred in Senate amendments (195-0)
- Re-reported on concurrence, as committed
On November 21, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to RULES
- In the House
- Third consideration and final passage (49-0)
On November 20, 2019 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
On November 19, 2019 in the House:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On November 18, 2019 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On October 25, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to LAW AND JUSTICE
On October 21, 2019 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (199-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On September 25, 2019 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 1561-1565
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration, with amendments
On September 24, 2019 in the House:
- Removed from table
On September 19, 2019 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On June 3, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to LIQUOR CONTROL
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (5)
December 17, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 1542 PN 2889, CONCUR
November 21, 2019: Senate Floor Vote: HB 1542 PN 2889, FINAL PASSAGE
October 21, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 1542 PN 2601, FP
September 25, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 1542 PN 2513, 2019 A2846, SOLOMON
September 25, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 1542 PN 2513, 2019 A2903, HEFFLEY
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor