+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (31)
On November 25, 2020 in the House:
- Act No. 124
- Approved by the Governor
On November 19, 2020 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
On November 18, 2020 in the House:
- Signed in Senate
- Signed in House
- Remarks see House Journal Page
- House concurred in Senate amendments (168-33)
- Re-reported on concurrence, as committed
On October 26, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to RULES
On October 21, 2020 in the House:
- In the House
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page
- Third consideration and final passage (46-3)
On September 9, 2020 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On June 22, 2020 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
On May 13, 2020 in the House:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On April 29, 2020 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On June 21, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to JUDICIARY
On June 19, 2019 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Remarks see House Journal Page 1187-1189
- Third consideration and final passage (194-7)
- Re-reported as committed
On June 18, 2019 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
- Re-reported as committed
On June 11, 2019 in the House:
- Re-committed to RULES
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On June 3, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to JUDICIARY
+ − Analysis
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
November 18, 2020: House Floor Vote: HB 1538 PN 3666, CONCUR
October 21, 2020: Senate Floor Vote: HB 1538 PN 3666, FINAL PASSAGE
June 19, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 1538 PN 1955, FP
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor