+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (25)
On May 21, 2020 in the House:
- Act No. 22
- Approved by the Governor
On May 18, 2020 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
- Signed in Senate
On May 14, 2020 in the House:
- Signed in House
On May 13, 2020 in the House:
- Third consideration and final passage (48-0)
On May 11, 2020 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On January 27, 2020 in the House:
- Second consideration
On October 29, 2019 in the House:
- Reported as committed
- First consideration
On June 21, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
On June 19, 2019 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (200-1)
- Re-reported as committed
On June 18, 2019 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 1153-1154
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
- Re-reported as committed
On June 4, 2019 in the House:
- Re-committed to RULES
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On May 29, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
+ − Analysis
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
May 13, 2020: Senate Floor Vote: HB 1522 PN 1917, FINAL PASSAGE
June 19, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 1522 PN 1917, FP
June 18, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 1522 PN 1917, 2019 A2105, D. MILLER
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor