+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On May 13, 2015 in the House:
- Act No. 1
- Approved by the Governor
On May 5, 2015 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
On May 4, 2015 in the House:
- Signed in Senate
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Signed in House
- House concurred in Senate amendments (191-0)
- Re-reported on concurrence, as committed
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to RULES
- In the House
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page 353
- Third consideration and final passage (49-0)
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Second consideration
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Re-reported as amended
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On February 6, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Remarks see House Journal Page 112
- Third consideration and final passage (199-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 96-97
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On January 22, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
+ − Votes (3)
April 21, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 152 PN 1181, CONCUR
April 15, 2015: Senate Floor Vote: HB 152 PN 1181, FINAL PASSAGE
February 3, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 152 PN 232, FP
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor