+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On July 1, 2020 in the House:
- Act No. 45
- Approved by the Governor
On June 22, 2020 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
- Signed in Senate
On June 10, 2020 in the House:
- Signed in House
- Remarks see House Journal Page
- House concurred in Senate amendments (202-0)
- Re-reported on concurrence, as committed
On June 9, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to RULES
- In the House
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page 547
- Third consideration and final passage (50-0)
On May 27, 2020 in the House:
- Second consideration
On May 26, 2020 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On June 21, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
On June 20, 2019 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (192-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On June 19, 2019 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
- Re-reported as committed
On June 10, 2019 in the House:
- Re-committed to RULES
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
+ − Analysis
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
June 10, 2020: House Floor Vote: HB 1510 PN 3854, CONCUR
June 9, 2020: Senate Floor Vote: HB 1510 PN 3854, FINAL PASSAGE
June 20, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 1510 PN 1895, FP
+ − Sponsors (38)
Type:
Primary Sponsor