+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On June 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Act No. 8A of 2021
- Approved by the Governor
On June 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Presented to the Governor
On June 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed in Senate
- Signed in House
- Third consideration and final passage (50-0)
On June 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second consideration
On June 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On June 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to APPROPRIATIONS
On June 16, 2021 in the House:
- Third consideration and final passage (202-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On June 7, 2021 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On May 26, 2021 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On May 25, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to APPROPRIATIONS
+ − Votes (2)
June 25, 2021: Senate Floor Vote: HB 1509 PN 1604, Final Passage
June 16, 2021: House Floor Vote: HB 1509 PN 1604, FP
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor