+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (24)
On October 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
On June 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Removed from table (29-21)
- Laid on the table
On June 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On April 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On December 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On October 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On June 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported as committed
- First consideration
On June 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
On June 8, 2021 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 810-817
- Third consideration and final passage (120-83)
- Re-reported as committed
On June 7, 2021 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On May 26, 2021 in the House:
- Removed from table
On May 25, 2021 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On May 19, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to HEALTH
+ − Analysis
+ − Votes (2)
June 8, 2021: House Floor Vote: HB 1500 PN 1563, FP
+ − Sponsors (67)
Type:
Primary Sponsor