+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On June 20, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to JUDICIARY
On June 14, 2016 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (195-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On June 13, 2016 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
- Re-reported as committed
On June 7, 2016 in the House:
- Re-committed to RULES
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On August 13, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to JUDICIARY
+ − Vote
June 14, 2016: House Floor Vote: HB 1498 PN 2110, FP
+ − Sponsors (40)
Type:
Primary Sponsor