+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On October 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
On September 29, 2021 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 1280-1281
- Third consideration and final passage (199-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On September 28, 2021 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On September 27, 2021 in the House:
- Removed from table
On September 15, 2021 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- Re-reported as committed
On June 8, 2021 in the House:
- Re-committed to RULES
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On May 26, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
+ − Analysis
+ − Vote
September 29, 2021: House Floor Vote: HB 1493 PN 1623, FP
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor