+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On October 24, 2016 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On July 12, 2016 in the House:
- Corrective Reprint, Printer's No. 3729
- Re-reported as committed
On June 14, 2016 in the House:
- Re-committed to RULES
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Re-referred to URBAN AFFAIRS
- Reported with request to re-refer to URBAN AFFAIRS
On August 21, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor