+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (32)
On November 3, 2022 in the House:
- Act No. 112 of 2022
- Approved by the Governor
On October 27, 2022 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
On October 26, 2022 in the House:
- Signed in Senate
- Signed in House
- Remarks see House Journal Page
- House concurred in Senate amendments (198-0)
- Re-reported on concurrence, as committed
- Referred to RULES
On October 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third consideration and final passage (50-0)
On October 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page
- Amended on third consideration (46-3)
On October 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Re-reported as committed
On June 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On June 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported as amended
- First consideration
On May 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
On May 24, 2022 in the House:
- Third consideration and final passage (203-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On May 23, 2022 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 445-446
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration, with amendments
On April 27, 2022 in the House:
- Removed from table
On November 10, 2021 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- Removed from table
On September 15, 2021 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- Re-reported as committed
On June 8, 2021 in the House:
- Re-committed to RULES
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On May 25, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
+ − Analysis
+ − Votes (5)
October 26, 2022: House Floor Vote: HB 1486 PN 3604, CONCURRENCE
October 26, 2022: Senate Floor Vote: HB 1486 PN 3604, Final Passage
October 25, 2022: Senate Floor Vote: HB 1486 PN 3315, 2021 A5855, ROBINSON Amendment No. A-5855-Reconsidered
May 24, 2022: House Floor Vote: HB 1486 PN 3130, FP
May 23, 2022: House Floor Vote: HB 1486 PN 1713, 2021 A1566
+ − Sponsors (30)
Type:
Primary Sponsor