+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (27)
On June 8, 2016 in the House:
- Act No. 38
- Approved by the Governor
On June 1, 2016 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
On May 30, 2016 in the House:
- Signed in Senate
On May 24, 2016 in the House:
- Signed in House
- House concurred in Senate amendments (189-0)
- Re-reported on concurrence, as committed
On May 18, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to RULES
On May 17, 2016 in the House:
- In the House
- Third consideration and final passage (48-0)
On May 11, 2016 in the House:
- Amended on third consideration
On May 9, 2016 in the House:
- Removed from table
On March 22, 2016 in the House:
- Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Second consideration
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On December 4, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
On November 23, 2015 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (196-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On November 19, 2015 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On November 18, 2015 in the House:
- Removed from table
On November 17, 2015 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On August 10, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
+ − Votes (3)
May 24, 2016: House Floor Vote: HB 1484 PN 3338, CONCUR
May 17, 2016: Senate Floor Vote: HB 1484 PN 3338, FINAL PASSAGE
November 23, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 1484 PN 2097, FP
+ − Sponsors (31)
Type:
Primary Sponsor