+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On July 9, 2013 in the House:
- Act No. 63
- Approved by the Governor
On June 30, 2013 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
- Signed in Senate
- Signed in House
- Remarks see House Journal Page 1407
- House concurred in Senate amendments
- Re-reported on concurrence, as committed
- Referred to RULES
On June 29, 2013 in the House:
- In the House
- Third consideration and final passage
On June 27, 2013 in the House:
- Second consideration
On June 25, 2013 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On June 20, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
On June 18, 2013 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage
- Re-reported as committed
On June 17, 2013 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
- Re-reported as committed
On June 10, 2013 in the House:
- Re-committed to RULES
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On June 5, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
+ − Votes (8)
June 30, 2013: House Floor Vote: HB 1482 PN 2153, CONCUR
June 29, 2013: Senate Floor Vote: HB 1482 PN 2153, FINAL PASSAGE
June 18, 2013: House Floor Vote: HB 1482 PN 2002, FP
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor