+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On June 20, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to LAW AND JUSTICE
On June 10, 2014 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage
- Re-reported as committed
On June 9, 2014 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On June 4, 2014 in the House:
- Removed from table
On September 23, 2013 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- Re-reported as committed
On June 26, 2013 in the House:
- Re-committed to RULES
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On June 4, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to LIQUOR CONTROL