+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On September 26, 2016 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On December 17, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to JUDICIARY
On December 2, 2015 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (191-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On December 1, 2015 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On November 24, 2015 in the House:
- Removed from table
On November 23, 2015 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On July 22, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
+ − Vote
December 2, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 1476 PN 2077, FP
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor