+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (23)
On June 16, 2016 in the House:
- Pamphlet Laws Resolution No. 2
- Filed in the Office of the Secretary of the Commonwealth
On June 15, 2016 in the House:
- Signed in Senate
On June 14, 2016 in the House:
- Signed in House
On June 13, 2016 in the House:
- Third consideration and final passage (45-2)
On June 6, 2016 in the House:
- Second consideration
On May 17, 2016 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
On March 22, 2016 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to FINANCE
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (200-0)
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Removed from table
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Re-referred to FINANCE
- Reported with request to re-refer to FINANCE
On January 22, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to INSURANCE
+ − Votes (2)
June 13, 2016: Senate Floor Vote: HB 147 PN 139, FINAL PASSAGE
February 24, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 147 PN 139, FP
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor