+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On June 28, 2019 in the House:
- Act No. 15
- Approved by the Governor
- Presented to the Governor
- Signed in Senate
- Signed in House
- House concurred in Senate amendments (181-16)
On June 27, 2019 in the House:
- Re-reported on concurrence, as committed
- Referred to RULES
- In the House
- Third consideration and final passage (29-21)
On June 26, 2019 in the House:
- Re-reported as amended
On June 19, 2019 in the House:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On June 18, 2019 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On June 14, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
On June 11, 2019 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (200-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On June 10, 2019 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 982-983
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration, with amendments
- Re-reported as committed
On June 4, 2019 in the House:
- Re-committed to RULES
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to HEALTH
+ − Analysis
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
June 28, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 1461 PN 2267, CONCUR
June 27, 2019: Senate Floor Vote: HB 1461 PN 2267, FINAL PASSAGE
June 11, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 1461 PN 2064, FP
June 10, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 1461 PN 1828, 2019 A1629, SNYDER
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor