+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (18)
On October 1, 2018 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
On September 25, 2018 in the House:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On June 6, 2018 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On January 2, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to FINANCE
On December 12, 2017 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (192-0)
- Re-reported as amended
On December 11, 2017 in the House:
- Amended in House Committee on APPROPRIATIONS
On November 21, 2017 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 1910-1915
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration, with amendments
On October 24, 2017 in the House:
- Removed from table
On October 17, 2017 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On May 31, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (2)
December 12, 2017: House Floor Vote: HB 1460 PN 2810, FP
November 21, 2017: House Floor Vote: HB 1460 PN 2595, 2017 A4830, RYAN
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor