+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On June 18, 2014 in the House:
- Act No. 59
- Approved by the Governor
On June 10, 2014 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
- Signed in Senate
On June 9, 2014 in the House:
- Signed in House
- Remarks see House Journal Page 684
- House concurred in Senate amendments
- Re-reported on concurrence, as committed
On June 4, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to RULES
- In the House
- Third consideration and final passage
On June 3, 2014 in the House:
- Amended on third consideration
On June 2, 2014 in the House:
- Re-reported as amended
On April 9, 2014 in the House:
- Second consideration
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On July 19, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to EDUCATION
On June 26, 2013 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Remarks see House Journal Page 1293
- Third consideration and final passage
- Re-reported as committed
On June 25, 2013 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
- Re-reported as committed
On June 19, 2013 in the House:
- Re-committed to RULES
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On May 30, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
+ − Votes (7)
June 9, 2014: House Floor Vote: HB 1460 PN 3647, CONCUR
June 4, 2014: Senate Floor Vote: HB 1460 PN 3647, FINAL PASSAGE
June 26, 2013: House Floor Vote: HB 1460 PN 1892, FP
June 25, 2013: House Rules Vote: House Bill 1460 - Report Bill As Committed
+ − Sponsors (33)
Type:
Primary Sponsor