+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On October 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On October 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On November 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
On November 8, 2021 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 1425-1426
- Third consideration and final passage (170-30)
- Re-reported as committed
On October 27, 2021 in the House:
- Second consideration
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Remarks see House Journal Page 1403-1407
On October 26, 2021 in the House:
- Removed from table
On September 15, 2021 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- Re-reported as committed
On June 23, 2021 in the House:
- Re-committed to RULES
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On May 20, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to HEALTH
+ − Analysis
+ − Votes (4)
November 8, 2021: House Floor Vote: HB 1443 PN 1900, FP
October 27, 2021: House Floor Vote: HB 1443 PN 1900, 2021 A2749
October 27, 2021: House Floor Vote: HB 1443 PN 1900, 2021 A2752
October 27, 2021: House Floor Vote: HB 1443 PN 1900, 2021 A2769
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor