+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On July 8, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
On June 24, 2019 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (199-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On June 20, 2019 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
- Re-reported as committed
On June 10, 2019 in the House:
- Re-committed to RULES
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On May 13, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
+ − Vote
June 24, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 1441 PN 1790, FP
+ − Sponsors (39)
Type:
Primary Sponsor