+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On February 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 170-172
- Third consideration and final passage (132-67)
- Re-reported as committed
On February 7, 2022 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 131-132
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration, with amendments
On January 26, 2022 in the House:
- Removed from table
On January 24, 2022 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On May 17, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
+ − Analysis
+ − Votes (2)
February 9, 2022: House Floor Vote: HB 1440 PN 2716, FP
February 7, 2022: House Floor Vote: HB 1440 PN 2642, 2021 A3595
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor