+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On July 23, 2020 in the House:
- Act No. 68
- Approved by the Governor
On July 15, 2020 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
- Signed in Senate
On July 14, 2020 in the House:
- Signed in House
- Remarks see House Journal Page
- House concurred in Senate amendments (201-0)
- Re-reported on concurrence, as committed
- Referred to RULES
- In the House
- Third consideration and final passage (49-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On July 13, 2020 in the House:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration, with amendments
On June 23, 2020 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On June 14, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to FINANCE
On June 11, 2019 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Remarks see House Journal Page 1437
- Third consideration and final passage (159-41)
- Re-reported as committed
On June 10, 2019 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On June 5, 2019 in the House:
- Removed from table
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to COMMERCE
+ − Analysis
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
July 14, 2020: House Floor Vote: HB 1437 PN 4124, CONCUR
July 14, 2020: Senate Floor Vote: HB 1437 PN 4124, FINAL PASSAGE
June 11, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 1437 PN 1775, FP
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor