+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (36)
On July 11, 2022 in the House:
- Act No. 54 of 2022
- Presented to the Governor
- Approved by the Governor
On July 8, 2022 in the House:
- Re-reported on concurrence, as committed
On July 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Re-reported on concurrence, as amended
- Senate concurred in House amendments to Senate amendments, as amended by the Senate (49-1)
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page 846-847
On July 8, 2022 in the House:
- Re-committed to RULES
- House concurred in Senate amendments to House amendments, as further amended by the Senate (185-14)
- Remarks see House Journal Page
- Signed in House
- Signed in Senate
- Signed in Senate
On July 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
On July 7, 2022 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page
- House concurred in Senate amendments, as amended by the House (185-15)
- Re-reported on concurrence, as amended
- Amended in House Committee on RULES
On June 21, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to RULES
On June 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third consideration and final passage (49-0)
- Re-reported as amended
On January 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On November 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On June 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
On June 9, 2021 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
- Third consideration and final passage (201-0)
- Remarks see House Journal Page 840-841
On June 8, 2021 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On June 7, 2021 in the House:
- Removed from table
On May 24, 2021 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On May 14, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
+ − Analysis
+ − Votes (7)
July 8, 2022: House Floor Vote: HB 1421 PN 3379, CONCUR
July 8, 2022: Senate Floor Vote: HB 1421 PN 3379, Concurrence in House Amendments to Senate Ammendments as Amended
July 7, 2022: House Floor Vote: HB 1421 PN 3375, CONCUR
June 20, 2022: Senate Floor Vote: HB 1421 PN 3271, Final Passage
June 9, 2021: House Floor Vote: HB 1421 PN 1528, FP
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor