+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On July 11, 2016 in the House:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
On June 29, 2016 in the House:
- Second consideration
On June 28, 2016 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Remarks see House Journal Page 91-95
- Third consideration and final passage (118-66)
- Re-reported as committed
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On December 17, 2015 in the House:
- Removed from table
On December 16, 2015 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On June 26, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
+ − Vote
January 27, 2016: House Floor Vote: HB 1413 PN 2668, FP
+ − Sponsors (28)
Type:
Primary Sponsor