+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On November 4, 2015 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- Removed from table
On September 21, 2015 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- Re-reported as committed
On June 30, 2015 in the House:
- Re-committed to RULES
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On June 28, 2015 in the House:
- Corrective Reprint, Printer's No. 1969
On June 25, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor