+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to EDUCATION
On January 13, 2014 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Remarks see House Journal Page 13-17
- Third consideration and final passage
On December 17, 2013 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
On December 16, 2013 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 2289-2293
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration, with amendments
On November 18, 2013 in the House:
- Removed from table
On October 16, 2013 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to EDUCATION
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
January 13, 2014: House Floor Vote: HB 1411 PN 2824, FP
December 16, 2013: House Floor Vote: HB 1411 PN 2506, 2013 A4188, CUTLER
December 16, 2013: House Floor Vote: HB 1411 PN 2506, 2013 A4502, CLYMER
October 16, 2013: House Education Vote: House Bill 1411 - Adopt Amendment A03796
October 16, 2013: House Education Vote: House Bill 1411 - Report Bill As Amended
+ − Sponsors (33)
Type:
Primary Sponsor