+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On November 27, 2019 in the House:
- Act No. 100
- Approved by the Governor
On November 22, 2019 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
On November 21, 2019 in the House:
- Signed in Senate
- Signed in House
- Remarks see House Journal Page 1937-1938, 1965
- House concurred in Senate amendments (187-0)
- Re-reported on concurrence, as committed
- Referred to RULES
On November 20, 2019 in the House:
- In the House
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page
- Third consideration and final passage (48-0)
On November 18, 2019 in the House:
- Second consideration
On October 29, 2019 in the House:
- Reported as amended
- First consideration
On June 6, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to JUDICIARY
On June 5, 2019 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Remarks see House Journal Page 963-964
- Third consideration and final passage (195-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On June 4, 2019 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 934-935
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration, with amendments
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- Removed from table
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On May 6, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to JUDICIARY
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
November 21, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 1402 PN 2817, CONCUR
November 20, 2019: Senate Floor Vote: HB 1402 PN 2817, FINAL PASSAGE
June 5, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 1402 PN 2006, FP
June 4, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 1402 PN 1835, 2019 A1533, D.MILLER
+ − Sponsors (37)
Type:
Primary Sponsor