+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
On December 4, 2015 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On February 6, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to EDUCATION
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (195-2)
- Re-reported as committed
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 111
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Removed from table
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On January 21, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to EDUCATION
+ − Vote
February 4, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 139 PN 123, FP
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor