+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On June 6, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
On June 4, 2019 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (196-0)
On June 3, 2019 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- Removed from table
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
+ − Vote
June 4, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 1388 PN 1692, FP
+ − Sponsors (37)
Type:
Primary Sponsor