+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On June 28, 2015 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 1323
- Third consideration and defeated on final passage (111-80)
On June 27, 2015 in the House:
- Re-reported as amended
On June 25, 2015 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
- Re-reported as committed
On June 23, 2015 in the House:
- Re-committed to RULES
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On June 22, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to APPROPRIATIONS
+ − Vote
June 28, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 1386 PN 1961, FP
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor