+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On July 8, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES
On June 27, 2019 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (200-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On June 26, 2019 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On June 25, 2019 in the House:
- Removed from table
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES
+ − Vote
June 27, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 1380 PN 1671, FP
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor