+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (193-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Removed from table
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
+ − Analysis
+ − Vote
March 20, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 138 PN 131, FP
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor