+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On September 28, 2021 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On September 27, 2021 in the House:
- Removed from table
On September 15, 2021 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- Re-reported as committed
On June 8, 2021 in the House:
- Re-committed to RULES
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On May 10, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
+ − Analysis
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor