+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On November 18, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to JUDICIARY
- In the Senate
- Remarks see House Journal Page
- Third consideration and final passage (120-81)
On October 19, 2020 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On July 13, 2020 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On May 14, 2020 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On April 6, 2020 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On December 18, 2019 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
On December 17, 2019 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 2055-2056
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration, with amendments
On December 16, 2019 in the House:
- Removed from table
On November 21, 2019 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- Removed from table
On September 17, 2019 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- Re-reported as committed
On June 5, 2019 in the House:
- Re-committed to RULES
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS
+ − Analysis
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
November 18, 2020: House Floor Vote: HB 1348 PN 3056, FP
December 17, 2019: House Floor Vote: HB 1348 PN 2013, 2019 A4264, ECKER
+ − Sponsors (65)
Type:
Primary Sponsor