+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On October 26, 2016 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
On October 25, 2016 in the House:
- Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration, with amendments
On October 19, 2016 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On October 9, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
On October 7, 2015 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
- Third consideration and final passage (200-0)
- In the Senate
On October 6, 2015 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 1698-1700
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On October 5, 2015 in the House:
- Removed from table
On September 30, 2015 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as amended
On June 24, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
+ − Votes (3)
October 7, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 1348 PN 2260, FP
October 6, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 1348 PN 2260, 2015 A3450, COHEN
October 6, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 1348 PN 2260, 2015 A3464, DALEY, M.
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor