+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On June 29, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to JUDICIARY
On June 28, 2016 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (200-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On June 27, 2016 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration, with amendments
On June 21, 2016 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On May 4, 2016 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Removed from table
On January 12, 2016 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- Removed from table
On December 10, 2015 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On June 16, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to JUDICIARY
+ − Votes (4)
June 28, 2016: House Floor Vote: HB 1339 PN 3645, FP
June 27, 2016: House Floor Vote: HB 1339 PN 1821, 2015 A8389, DEAN
June 27, 2016: House Floor Vote: HB 1339 PN 1821, 2015 A6204, CRUZ
+ − Sponsors (32)
Type:
Primary Sponsor