+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (24)
On July 8, 2016 in the House:
- Act No. 77
- Approved by the Governor
On June 30, 2016 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
- Signed in Senate
- Signed in House
On June 29, 2016 in the House:
- Third consideration and final passage (49-1)
On June 15, 2016 in the House:
- Removed from table
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
On December 4, 2015 in the House:
- Removed from table
- Laid on the table
On November 18, 2015 in the House:
- Second consideration
On October 20, 2015 in the House:
- Reported as committed
- First consideration
On September 25, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
On September 21, 2015 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (197-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On July 22, 2015 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On July 21, 2015 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
On June 22, 2015 in the House:
- Re-committed to RULES
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On June 16, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to TRANSPORTATION
+ − Votes (2)
June 29, 2016: Senate Floor Vote: HB 1335 PN 1817, FINAL PASSAGE
September 21, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 1335 PN 1817, FP
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor