+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On January 28, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to FINANCE
On December 4, 2015 in the House:
- In the Senate
- Third consideration and final passage (189-0)
- Re-reported as committed
On December 3, 2015 in the House:
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration
On December 2, 2015 in the House:
- Removed from table
On November 4, 2015 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- Removed from table
On September 21, 2015 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- Re-reported as committed
On June 24, 2015 in the House:
- Re-committed to RULES
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On June 16, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT