+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 14, 2016 in the House:
- Act No. 12
- Approved by the Governor
On April 5, 2016 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor
On April 4, 2016 in the House:
- Signed in Senate
- Signed in House
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Remarks see Senate Journal Page
- Third consideration and final passage (48-0)
On March 21, 2016 in the House:
- Second consideration
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On October 22, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
On October 20, 2015 in the House:
- Re-reported as committed
- Remarks see House Journal Page 1807
- Third consideration and final passage (175-22)
- In the Senate
On October 19, 2015 in the House:
- Remarks see House Journal Page 1773-1775
- Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
- Second consideration, with amendments
On October 7, 2015 in the House:
- Removed from table
On September 21, 2015 in the House:
- Laid on the table
- Re-reported as committed
On June 24, 2015 in the House:
- Re-committed to RULES
- First consideration
- Reported as committed
On June 11, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to CONSUMER AFFAIRS
+ − Votes (5)
March 23, 2016: Senate Floor Vote: HB 1326 PN 2396, FINAL PASSAGE
October 20, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 1326 PN 2396, MOT PROCEED WITH BILL, REED
October 20, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 1326 PN 2396, 2015 A3670, SUSP RULES, HARPER
October 20, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 1326 PN 2396, FP
October 19, 2015: House Floor Vote: HB 1326 PN 1787, 2015 A3467, GODSHALL
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor